Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2072 31/10/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03072 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 31/10/1959
Withdrawn 08/03/1981
Time in Service 21 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 31/10/1959
51A Darlington 4w/e 20/07/1968
   Withdrawn 08/03/1981

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1959 To Service To service as D2072
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)
   
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03072    
08/03/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 03072    

prev prev