Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2073 05/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03073 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 05/11/1959
Withdrawn 23/05/1989
Time in Service 29 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 05/11/1959
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 15/07/1967
55B York (North) w/e 14/12/1968
50C Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 16/12/1972
   Withdrawn 23/05/1989

Preservation
Preservation Date 18/01/1991
Current Status Operational
Status Date 15/09/2011
Information Currently at The Railway Age, Crewe. This locomotive is operational and is used for the 'Driver for a Fiver' promotion where members of the public can take the controls for a return trip on the demonstration line.
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=3&loco=03073


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1959 To Service To service as D2073
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)
   
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
14/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
16/12/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03073    
23/05/1989 Withdrawn      

prev prev