Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 962 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18765 Week
» 71781 Month
» 191308 Year
» 3218161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2073 |
05/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03073 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
18/11/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Preservation Date |
18/01/1991 |
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
15/09/2011 |
Information |
Currently at The Railway Age, Crewe. This locomotive is operational and is used for the 'Driver for a Fiver' promotion where members of the public can take the controls for a return trip on the demonstration line. |
Link |
www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=3&loco=03073 |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2073 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
18/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03073 |
|
|
23/05/1989 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|