Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15715 Week
» 80669 Month
» 283333 Year
» 3310186 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2079 |
07/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03079 |
01/1974 |
|
Departmental (97/8) |
97805 |
|
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97805 |
04/1984 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
07/01/1960 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
03/06/1996 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/01/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2079 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03079 |
|
|
22/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
1984 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 97805 but not taken up |
|
|
04/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97805 |
|
|
03/06/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97805 |
|
|