Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 223 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 223 Week
» 11770 Month
» 411452 Year
» 488039 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2079 07/01/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03079 01/01/1973
Departmental (Dept) 97805 04/1984

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 07/01/1960
Withdrawn 03/06/1996
Time in Service 36 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51L Thornaby (New) 07/01/1960
51A Darlington w/e 23/01/1960
GD Gateshead 2w/e 22/02/1976
   Withdrawn 03/06/1996

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/01/1960 To Service To service as D2079
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Thornaby (51L)
   
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03079    
22/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
04/1984 Renumbered Renumbered to 97805    
03/06/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 97805    

prev prev