Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 580 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1714 Week
» 21447 Month
» 318461 Year
» 395048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D208 27/08/1958
TOPS (Tops) 40008 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 27/08/1958
Withdrawn 14/11/1982
Time in Service 24 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1988
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Information Loco due E exam,bogies donated to 40033
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 27/08/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 07/10/1961
32B Ipswich w/e 23/04/1966
34G Finsbury Park w/e 05/11/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 03/12/1966
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 05/07/1967
91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/08/1967
8J Allerton w/e 06/04/1968
D08 Liverpool Division 17/06/1968
D10 Preston Division w/e 11/07/1970
D09 Manchester Division w/e 07/11/1970
   Withdrawn 14/11/1982


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/08/1958 To Service To service as D208
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
06/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/11/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40008    
14/11/1982 Withdrawn Condemned as 40008    
01/06/1988 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev