Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 807 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2715 Week
» 18913 Month
» 183813 Year
» 694915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2081 05/02/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03081 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 05/02/1960
Withdrawn 12/10/1980
Time in Service 20 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 05/02/1960
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/06/1963
50A York (North) 4w/e 19/06/1965
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 28/01/1967
50D Goole 4w/e 04/11/1967
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 08/01/1972
SF Stratford 2w/e 01/06/1974
   Withdrawn 12/10/1980

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/02/1960 To Service To service as D2081
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)
   
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
04/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03081    
01/06/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
12/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 03081    

prev prev