Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 499 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5100 Week
» 16647 Month
» 416329 Year
» 492916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2084 19/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03084 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 19/03/1959
Withdrawn 05/07/1987
Time in Service 28 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73F Ashford (New) 19/03/1959
73C Hither Green 4w/e 05/03/1962
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/12/1963
73C Hither Green m/e 12/10/1964
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 07/02/1966
70F Bournemouth 2w/e 07/05/1969
75C Selhurst 2w/e 31/12/1969
70F Bournemouth 3w/e 27/08/1971
NR Norwich Thorpe 2w/e 11/10/1975
91E To Eastern Region m/e 31/10/1975
   Withdrawn 05/07/1987

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/03/1959 To Service To service as D2084
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)
   
05/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
09/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
07/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
07/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
31/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Selhurst (75C)    
27/08/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03084    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR)    
31/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
05/07/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 03084    

prev prev