Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2086 |
05/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03086 |
12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
11/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2086 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
17/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03086 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR) |
|
|
13/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03086 |
|
|
03/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|