Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1969 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19772 Week
» 72788 Month
» 192315 Year
» 3219168 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2087 |
24/06/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2087 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
19/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
01/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
13/06/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2087 |
|
|
03/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Pounds: at Fratton TMD |
|
|