Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 863 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1742 Week
» 10484 Month
» 354663 Year
» 865765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2088 01/07/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 01/07/1959
Withdrawn 08/06/1972
Time in Service 12 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1973
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82C Swindon (New) 01/07/1959
16C Derby w/e 27/05/1967
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 22/07/1967
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 07/12/1968
30A Stratford w/e 19/12/1970
30E Colchester w/e 02/01/1971
   Withdrawn 08/06/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1959 To Service To service as D2088
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Inside the stock shed RO 1/1965 Link
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
22/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
19/12/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
02/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
08/06/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2088    
01/03/1973 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev