Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 314 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3776 Week
» 23509 Month
» 320523 Year
» 397110 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D209 15/09/1958
TOPS (Tops) 40009 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 15/09/1958
Withdrawn 07/11/1984
Time in Service 26 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1985
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Information Vacuum loco,bearings and traction motor problems
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 15/09/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 07/10/1961
32B Ipswich w/e 23/04/1966
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 05/07/1967
91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/08/1967
8J Allerton w/e 06/04/1968
D08 Liverpool Division 17/06/1968
D10 Preston Division w/e 09/05/1970
D09 Manchester Division w/e 07/11/1970
   Withdrawn 07/11/1984


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/09/1958 To Service To service as D209
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
06/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
07/11/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
27/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517 Link
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40009    
07/11/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 40009    
01/03/1985 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev