Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 893 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6498 Week
» 18045 Month
» 417727 Year
» 494314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2090 05/05/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03090 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 05/05/1960
Withdrawn 18/07/1976
Time in Service 16 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 05/05/1960
55B York (North) w/e 11/11/1972
   Withdrawn 18/07/1976

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/05/1960 To Service To service as D2090
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)
   
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03090    
18/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03090    

prev prev