Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 512 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14555 Week
» 79509 Month
» 282173 Year
» 3309026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2094 |
28/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03094 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
28/06/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
08/01/1988 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/09/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
28/09/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2094 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03094 |
|
|
08/01/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03094 |
|
|