Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2098 02/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03098 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 02/07/1960
Withdrawn 08/11/1975
Time in Service 15 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 0000
Cut At Unknown (Russia)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 02/07/1960
56G Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 09/07/1960
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 01/06/1963
51A Darlington 4w/e 20/07/1968
   Withdrawn 08/11/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by Unknown: Russia    
02/07/1960 To Service To service as D2098
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
09/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03098    
08/11/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 03098    

prev prev