Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 79 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4345 Week
» 16123 Month
» 305515 Year
» 816617 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2099 15/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03099 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 15/07/1960
Withdrawn 10/02/1976
Time in Service 15 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 15/07/1960
51L Thornaby w/e 23/07/1960
51A Darlington 4w/e 27/03/1965
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 23/04/1966
51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/10/1967
   Withdrawn 10/02/1976

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/07/1960 To Service To service as D2099
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
23/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03099    
10/02/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03099    

prev prev