Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3499 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16905 Week
» 69921 Month
» 189448 Year
» 3216301 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D211 |
20/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40011 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
20/05/1959 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawn |
05/10/1980 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1980 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
20/05/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1976 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D211 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Willesden (1A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40011 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
05/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40011 |
|
|
11/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|