Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2111 |
25/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03111 |
16/11/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2111 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
12/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
16/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03111 |
|
|
03/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (HS) |
|
|
29/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
18/11/1976 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
27/07/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03111 |
|
|
02/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|