Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 328 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1194 Week
» 25856 Month
» 284715 Year
» 795817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2113 23/12/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03113 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 23/12/1960
Withdrawn 03/08/1975
Time in Service 14 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 23/12/1960
   Withdrawn 03/08/1975

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1960 To Service To service as D2113
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. SLS 5/1962 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03113    
03/08/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 03113    

prev prev