Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 143 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6120 Week
» 22318 Month
» 187218 Year
» 698320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2117 04/09/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 04/09/1959
Withdrawn 09/10/1971
Time in Service 12 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87C Danygraig (New) 04/09/1959
87E Landore 6w/e 13/04/1964
16C Derby w/e 29/04/1967
12D Workington w/e 24/06/1967
8C Speke Junction w/e 06/01/1968
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 31/01/1970
   Stored (Springs Branch (Wigan)) w/e 09/05/1970
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 29/08/1970
   Withdrawn 09/10/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/09/1959 To Service To service as D2117
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Danygraig (87C)
   
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
31/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Loaned to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/05/1970 To Store To Store at Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
29/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2117    

prev prev