Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 387 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1259 Week
» 13037 Month
» 302429 Year
» 813531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2118 17/09/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 17/09/1959
Withdrawn 18/06/1972
Time in Service 12 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87C Danygraig (New) 17/09/1959
87E Landore 6w/e 13/04/1964
16C Derby w/e 29/04/1967
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn 18/06/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/09/1959 To Service To service as D2118
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Danygraig (87C)
   
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
18/06/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2118    

prev prev