Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 593 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6570 Week
» 22768 Month
» 187668 Year
» 698770 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2122 30/10/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 30/10/1959
Withdrawn 26/11/1972
Time in Service 13 yrs , 27 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1975
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87C Danygraig (New) 30/10/1959
87E Landore 6w/e 13/04/1964
82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 16/10/1971
85A Worcester 9w/e 16/10/1971
82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn 26/11/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1959 To Service To service as D2122
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Danygraig (87C)
   
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
26/11/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2122    
01/08/1975 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev