Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2123 |
12/11/1959 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
12/11/1959 to Danygraig (87C) |
Withdrawn |
28/12/1968 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1978 |
Cut At |
Birds (Bristol) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2123 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2123 |
|
|
11/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Bristol |
|
|