Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 839 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 3505 Week
» 12247 Month
» 356426 Year
» 867528 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2123 12/11/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 12/11/1959
Withdrawn 28/12/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1978
Cut At Birds (Bristol)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87C Danygraig (New) 12/11/1959
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 23/04/1960
85A Worcester 4w/e 03/12/1960
82C Swindon 10w/e 28/08/1966
   Withdrawn 28/12/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1959 To Service To service as D2123
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Danygraig (87C)
   
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
28/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
28/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2123    
26/07/1969 Sightings At Birds, Long Marston: In scrapyard RO489 11/69 Link
01/11/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Bristol    

prev prev