Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1408 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19211 Week
» 72227 Month
» 191754 Year
» 3218607 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2127 |
24/12/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2127 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (84B) |
|
|
14/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2127 |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kingsbury |
|
|