Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 587 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 587 Week
» 19913 Month
» 246674 Year
» 757776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2128 07/01/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03128 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 07/01/1960
Withdrawn 04/07/1976
Time in Service 16 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 07/01/1960
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 08/11/1964
85A Worcester 4w/e 27/12/1964
82C Swindon 8w/e 30/10/1966
82A Bristol Bath Road 5w/e 14/06/1969
84A Laira (Reinstated) w/e 04/04/1970
   Withdrawn m/e 25/09/1971
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 19/06/1976
   Withdrawn 04/07/1976

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/01/1960 To Service To service as D2128
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
27/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
30/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
04/04/1970 Reinstated Reinstated to Laira (84A)    
25/09/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2128    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03128    
19/06/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
04/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03128    

prev prev