Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 18 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6233 Week
» 17938 Month
» 349427 Year
» 426014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2133 23/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 23/02/1960
Withdrawn 07/1969
Time in Service 9 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83B Taunton (New) 23/02/1960
82C Swindon 5w/e 01/05/1966
83B Taunton 7w/e 19/06/1966
Taunton PAD   w/e 28/08/1966
83B Taunton q/e 15/01/1967
82A Bristol Bath Road 7w/e 27/07/1968
   Withdrawn 07/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/02/1960 To Service To service as D2133
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Taunton (83B)
   
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
19/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
28/08/1966 Allocation      
15/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
07/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2133    

prev prev