Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2134 29/02/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03134 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 29/02/1960
Withdrawn 04/07/1976
Time in Service 16 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83B Taunton (New) 29/02/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 31/12/1960
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 29/11/1964
85A Worcester 4w/e 08/08/1965
83B Taunton 8w/e 30/10/1966
82A Bristol Bath Road 7w/e 27/07/1968
84A Laira 5w/e 14/06/1969
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 19/06/1976
   Withdrawn 04/07/1976

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/02/1960 To Service To service as D2134
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Taunton (83B)
   
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
08/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
30/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
22/07/1969 Sightings Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot. RO 10/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03134    
19/06/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
04/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03134    

prev prev