Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 878 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14284 Week
» 67300 Month
» 186827 Year
» 3213680 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2135 |
21/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03135 |
03/1975 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/03/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2135 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
To Store |
To Store (at 85A) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
18/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
03/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03135 |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03135 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P Woods (Shipbreaking): Queenborough |
|
|