Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2137 30/03/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03137 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 30/03/1960
Withdrawn 11/07/1976
Time in Service 16 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
85B Gloucester Horton Road (New) 30/03/1960
   Stored (at 85A) 4w/e 31/08/1967
36A Doncaster w/e 11/11/1967
BG Hull Botanic Gardens 2w/e 27/07/1974
   Withdrawn 11/07/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1960 To Service To service as D2137
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)
   
31/08/1967 To Store To Store (at 85A)    
11/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03137    
27/07/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG)    
11/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03137    
01/12/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev