Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 143 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6120 Week
» 22318 Month
» 187218 Year
» 698320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2139 11/04/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 11/04/1960
Withdrawn 11/05/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs , 1 mth
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
85B Gloucester Horton Road (New) 11/04/1960
85A Worcester 4w/e 21/05/1960
   Stored (at 85A) 4w/e 31/08/1967
   Withdrawn 11/05/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/04/1960 To Service To service as D2139
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)
   
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
31/08/1967 To Store To Store (at 85A)    
11/05/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2139    

prev prev