Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 401 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18204 Week
» 71220 Month
» 190747 Year
» 3217600 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2142 |
12/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03142 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
83B |
|
Taunton (New) |
on |
12/05/1960 |
87E |
|
Landore |
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/10/1983 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2142 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03142 |
|
|
02/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03142 |
|
|
26/10/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|