Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 71 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2110 Week
» 21436 Month
» 248197 Year
» 759299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2144 19/01/1961
TOPS (Tops) 03144 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 19/01/1961
Withdrawn 23/02/1986
Time in Service 25 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82C Swindon (New) 19/01/1961
85A Worcester 2w/e 21/02/1965
87E Landore 6w/e 19/09/1965
   Withdrawn 23/02/1986

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/01/1961 To Service To service as D2144
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
21/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03144    
23/02/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 03144    

prev prev