Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 794 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2702 Week
» 18900 Month
» 183800 Year
» 694902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2145 12/02/1961
TOPS (Tops) 03145 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 12/02/1961
Withdrawn 07/07/1985
Time in Service 24 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82C Swindon (New) 12/02/1961
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 30/12/1961
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 29/11/1964
87E Landore 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn 07/07/1985

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/02/1961 To Service To service as D2145
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03145    
07/07/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 03145    

prev prev