Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2148 24/05/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 24/05/1960
Withdrawn 19/11/1972
Time in Service 12 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 24/05/1960
52E Percy Main w/e 04/06/1960
52A Gateshead w/e 16/07/1960
56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 25/02/1967
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 22/04/1967
   Withdrawn 19/11/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/05/1960 To Service To service as D2148
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
19/11/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2148    

prev prev