Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3153 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16559 Week
» 69575 Month
» 189102 Year
» 3215955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2149 |
30/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03149 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2149 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
21/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
24/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03149 |
|
|
01/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
28/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03149 |
|
|
09/07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|