Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 922 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18725 Week
» 71741 Month
» 191268 Year
» 3218121 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2150 |
10/06/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2150 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
19/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2150 from York (North) (55B) |
|
|
07/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cotswold Rail: at Gloucester |
|
|