Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17812 Week
» 70828 Month
» 190355 Year
» 3217208 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2152 |
22/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03152 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
22/06/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
02/10/1983 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1974 |
|
Cab height reduced |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2152 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03152 |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Cab height reduced |
|
|
02/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03152 |
|
|