Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 863 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1742 Week
» 10484 Month
» 354663 Year
» 865765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2156 08/08/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03156 26/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 08/08/1960
Withdrawn 22/11/1975
Time in Service 15 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 0000
Cut At Unknown (Trieste, Italy)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 08/08/1960
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 20/08/1960
52A Gateshead w/e 28/12/1968
   Withdrawn 22/11/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by Unknown: Trieste, Italy    
08/08/1960 To Service To service as D2156
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
28/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 03156    
22/11/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 03156    

prev prev