Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2157 |
16/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03157 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/08/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2157 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
21/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03157 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
29/12/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03157 |
|
|
05/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Chiari Steelworks, Italy: Chiari |
|
|