Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18638 Week
» 71654 Month
» 191181 Year
» 3218034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2158 |
22/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03158 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
22/08/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
05/07/1987 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
04/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2158 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
08/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03158 |
|
|
11/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (CR) |
|
|
05/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03158 |
|
|