Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3979 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17385 Week
» 70401 Month
» 189928 Year
» 3216781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2160 |
05/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03160 |
03/1975 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 11/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2160 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
11/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
03/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03160 |
|
|
13/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03160 |
|
|
22/04/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|