Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 96 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17899 Week
» 70915 Month
» 190442 Year
» 3217295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2162 |
21/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03162 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
21/09/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
23/05/1989 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
24/12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2162 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
24/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03162 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (CR) |
|
|
23/05/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03162 |
|
|