Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3476 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16882 Week
» 69898 Month
» 189425 Year
» 3216278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2163 |
03/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03163 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2163 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
21/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03163 |
|
|
14/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03163 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|