Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 595 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6572 Week
» 22770 Month
» 187670 Year
» 698772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2167 01/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03167 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 01/11/1960
Withdrawn 20/07/1975
Time in Service 14 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51A Darlington (New) 01/11/1960
   Withdrawn 20/07/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/11/1960 To Service To service as D2167
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Darlington (51A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03167    
20/07/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 03167    
01/06/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev