Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2168 |
08/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03168 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2168 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03168 |
|
|
09/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03168 |
|
|
04/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|