Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 863 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1742 Week
» 10484 Month
» 354663 Year
» 865765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2169 15/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03169 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 15/11/1960
Withdrawn 02/11/1975
Time in Service 14 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1976
Cut At Drapers (Hull Botanic Gardens MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50B Hull Dairycoates (New) 15/11/1960
50D Goole 4w/e 22/06/1968
50C Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 10/02/1973
   Withdrawn 02/11/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/11/1960 To Service To service as D2169
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)
   
22/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03169    
10/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C)    
02/11/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 03169    
01/06/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull Botanic Gardens MPD    

prev prev