Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4289 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13863 Week
» 78817 Month
» 281481 Year
» 3308334 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2169 |
15/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03169 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2169 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03169 |
|
|
02/11/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03169 |
|
|
06/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull Botanic Gardens MPD |
|
|