Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1489 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14895 Week
» 67911 Month
» 187438 Year
» 3214291 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D217 |
09/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40017 |
03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
CARINTHIA |
16/06/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
09/06/1959 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/1981 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1981 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
09/06/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D217 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Naming |
Named 'CARINTHIA' |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
21/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40017 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40017 |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|