Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4344 Week
» 16122 Month
» 305514 Year
» 816616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2170 21/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03170 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 21/11/1960
Withdrawn 03/1989
Time in Service 28 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50B Hull Dairycoates (New) 21/11/1960
50C Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 03/03/1962
50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 02/12/1967
55H Neville Hill w/e 23/11/1968
52A Gateshead w/e 30/08/1969
   Withdrawn 03/1989

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/11/1960 To Service To service as D2170
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)
   
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C)    
02/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
23/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
30/08/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03170    
03/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 03170    

prev prev